Senate | 03/24/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.116 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.55 | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | substituted for a4016 | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.117 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |