Senate | 03/24/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.118 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.45 | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | substituted for a991 | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | referred to social services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.120 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |