Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.648 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.681 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a1722b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.777 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1381A | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |