Senate | 11/17/2023 | VETOED MEMO.69 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.749 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a2608 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1046 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |