Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.697 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.430 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | substituted for a782 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.246 |