Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.649 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.748 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a250a | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 1466 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1466A | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.345 |