Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.73 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.642 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.458 | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | substituted for a7215 | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.557 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.379 |