Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.650 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.139 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | substituted for a1296 | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.505 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |