Senate | 05/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4871B | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.850 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1535B | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.812 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a4871a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1535A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.633 |