Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.610 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.218 |