Senate | 06/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1604F | ||
Senate | 06/02/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1604E | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1604D | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1604C | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1604B | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1604A |