Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3475A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1126 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1611A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |