Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.105 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1634B | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | AMENDED 1634A | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.200 |