Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1926A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1683A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.686 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |