Senate | 12/08/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.44 | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.698 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.772 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a6843a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1684A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.885 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |