Senate | 12/08/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.45 | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.699 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.652 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | substituted for a6716a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1458 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1690A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | REFERRED TO BANKS |