Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6253A | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1469 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1694B | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1694A | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |