Senate | 11/17/2023 | VETOED MEMO.70 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.196 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | substituted for a4601a | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.635 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1725A | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |