Senate | 09/07/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.357 | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.460 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | substituted for a6091 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.195 |