Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.74 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.643 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a3780e | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1626 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1736E | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1736D | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1736C | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1018 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1736B | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1736A | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |