Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1057C | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1072 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1759B | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1759A |