Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.652 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.137 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | substituted for a4349 | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.190 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |