Senate | 02/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to energy | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1567 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1793C | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1793B | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1793A | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |