Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.653 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.138 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | substituted for a4672 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.303 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |