Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.413 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |