Assembly | 02/13/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.128 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1812A | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.191 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |