Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2609A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1839A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.520 |