Senate | 05/21/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | referred to small business | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.192 |