Senate | 12/08/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.46 | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.700 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.607 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | substituted for a7295a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1873A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.181 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |