Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2487A | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1900A | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.774 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1457 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |