Senate | 12/22/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.78 | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.756 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.841 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a7456a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1663 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1931B | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1931A | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |