Senate | 05/20/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3865A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1103 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1965A | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1178 |