Assembly | 03/19/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.476 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2016B | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1627 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2016A |