Senate | 07/19/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.198 | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.51 | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | substituted for a3652 | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.335 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |