Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.76 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.645 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.479 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a3872a | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1684 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2094A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |