Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1189 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.305 |