Senate | 11/17/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.28 | ||
Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.654 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted for a5200b | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2099C | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.833 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2099B | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2099A | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |