Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1444 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1459 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |