Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1755 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 05/24/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2127C | ||
Senate | 05/24/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2127B | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2127A |