Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.591 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a3351b | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.851 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2129B | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1664 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2129A |