Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.131 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.482 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted for a129 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.834 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |