Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.550 |