Senate | 03/24/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.119 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.79 | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | substituted for a606 | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.159 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |