Senate | 03/03/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.103 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.65 | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2023 | substituted for a1706 | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.167 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |