Assembly | 05/16/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2237B | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1736 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2237A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |