Senate | 11/22/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.502 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.366 | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | substituted for a3225 | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.137 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1240 |