Senate | 03/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2276B | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 2276A | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |