LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S02294
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S02294
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S02294
Action History
Senate
05/22/2023
SUBSTITUTED BY A2134A
Senate
05/16/2023
AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2294A
Senate
02/27/2023
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
02/15/2023
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
02/14/2023
1ST REPORT CAL.367
Senate
01/19/2023
REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT