Assembly | 05/22/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1148 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.460 |