Senate | 03/12/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 2331A | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1340 |